House | 04/22/2013 | File Number 585 | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | House Calendar Number 400 | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |