House | 03/15/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |