House | 04/25/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | File Number 251 | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | House Calendar Number 181 | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Public Hearing 01/31 | ||
House | 01/23/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |