Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
File Number 883
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 684
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 8301
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 8220
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8075
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
File Number 205
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
House Calendar Number 148
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/05
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|