House | 04/12/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | File Number 11 | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | House Calendar Number 38 | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/25/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 01/28/2013 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |