House | 04/22/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | File Number 122 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | House Calendar Number 104 | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health | ||
House | 01/28/2013 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |