House
|
06/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Public Act 13-131
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 348
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
File Number 76
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
House Calendar Number 74
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/05
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|