House | 06/06/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Public Act 13-99 | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 555 | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | File Number 500 | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 317 | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Vote to Draft |