House | 07/11/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/20/2013 | Public Act 13-269 | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 519 | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | File Number 593 | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | House Calendar Number 405 | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |