House | 07/11/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/20/2013 | Public Act 13-270 | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 423 | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | File Number 168 | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | House Calendar Number 131 | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
House | 01/31/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |