House | 02/06/2013 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/05/2013 | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Housing | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Housing | ||
House | 02/01/2013 | Change of Reference Housing | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |