House | 03/06/2013 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Aging | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Aging | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Change of Reference Aging | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Change of Reference Human Services | ||
House | 01/24/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |