House | 05/28/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Public Act 13-24 | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 510 | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | File Number 398 | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | House Calendar Number 266 | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/01/2013 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/31/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |