Senate | 06/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/14/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/13/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/10/2013 | Public Act 13-190 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 685 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | File Number 358 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | House Calendar Number 237 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/01/2013 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/31/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |