House | 06/21/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/11/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/06/2013 | Special Act 13-15 | ||
House | 06/01/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/01/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 355 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | File Number 322 | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | House Calendar Number 222 | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |