House | 04/24/2013 | File Number 627 | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | File Number 324 | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | House Calendar Number 224 | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 01/31/2013 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
House | 01/30/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |