House | 04/24/2013 | File Number 628 | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | House Calendar Number 416 | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |