House | 04/10/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | File Number 209 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 152 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Vote to Draft |