House
|
06/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Public Act 13-168
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 624
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
File Number 327
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
House Calendar Number 227
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|