House
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Public Act 13-11
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
File Number 582
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 424
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5597
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
File Number 172
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
House Calendar Number 135
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2013
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|