Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2013

Chaptered

Bill June 4, 2013

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 17, 2013
Bill March 25, 2013