LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06267
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06267
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2013 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06267
Action History
House
03/27/2013
Merged Into SB00530
House
02/28/2013
Vote to Draft
House
02/15/2013
Public Hearing 02/19
House
02/05/2013
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
House
01/29/2013
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce