House | 06/06/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/03/2013 | Public Act 13-103 | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/30/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 556 | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | File Number 572 | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | House Calendar Number 358 | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/13/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |