House | 06/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/05/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/04/2013 | Public Act 13-134 | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/31/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 346 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | File Number 16 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 41 | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/01/2013 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
House | 01/31/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |