House | 04/09/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | File Number 210 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 153 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 01/31/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |