House
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-273
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
File Number 789
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 564
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6163
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6114
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
File Number 38
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
House Calendar Number 66
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|