House | 04/10/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | File Number 40 | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | House Calendar Number 68 | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
House | 02/01/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |