House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Public Act 13-106
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
File Number 785
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 558
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6426
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
File Number 212
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
House Calendar Number 155
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
|
|
|