House | 05/08/2013 | File Number 767 | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | House Calendar Number 526 | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |