House | 05/01/2013 | File Number 660 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | House Calendar Number 452 | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |