House | 05/09/2013 | File Number 777 | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | House Calendar Number 538 | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |