House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Public Act 13-108
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
File Number 800
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 579
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6387
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6409
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
File Number 503
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
House Calendar Number 320
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|