House
|
05/14/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Children
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Children
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
File Number 676
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Calendar Number 454
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|