Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2013
|
Public Act 13-298
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8919
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 694
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8478
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
File Number 427
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
House Calendar Number 280
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|