House
|
06/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Public Act 13-169
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 623
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
File Number 769
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
House Calendar Number 527
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|