House | 05/07/2013 | File Number 758 | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | File Number 308 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 197 | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |