House | 05/13/2013 | File Number 801 | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 586 | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6714 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | File Number 213 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 156 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |