House | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 342 | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | File Number 29 | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | House Calendar Number 56 | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |