House
|
06/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Public Act 13-170
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
File Number 845
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 638
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7361
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
File Number 124
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
House Calendar Number 106
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|