Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-275
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 676
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
File Number 402
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
House Calendar Number 270
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|