House | 03/20/2013 | File Number 83 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | House Calendar Number 81 | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |