House
|
06/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Public Act 13-195
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 636
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
File Number 662
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
House Calendar Number 455
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|