House | 05/08/2013 | File Number 770 | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | House Calendar Number 528 | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |