House
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Public Act 13-111
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6864
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 521
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
File Number 174
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
House Calendar Number 137
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|