Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06411 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6411
22 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 2837
33 *02837_______HS_*
44 Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES
55 Introduced by:
66 (HS)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 6411
1111
1212 January Session, 2013
1313
1414 LCO No. 2837
1515
1616 *02837_______HS_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (HS)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING MEDICAID COVERAGE FOR CHIROPRACTIC SERVICES.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 17b-28e of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2013):
2929
3030 (a) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include, on and after January 1, 2009, hospice services as optional services covered under the Medicaid program. Said state plan amendment shall supersede any regulations of Connecticut state agencies concerning such optional services. From January 1, 2013, to June 30, 2013, inclusive, hospice services covered under the Medicaid program for individuals who are residents in long-term care facilities shall be paid at a rate that is ninety-five per cent of the facility's per diem rate.
3131
3232 (b) Effective July 1, 2013, the Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include foreign language interpreter services provided to any beneficiary with limited English proficiency as a covered service under the Medicaid program. Not later than July 1, 2013, the commissioner shall develop and implement the use of medical billing codes for foreign language interpreter services.
3333
3434 (c) Effective July 1, 2013, the Department of Social Services shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, semi-annually, to the Council on Medical Assistance Program Oversight on the foreign language interpreter services provided to recipients of benefits under the program.
3535
3636 (d) Not later than October 1, 2011, the Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to include podiatry as an optional service under the Medicaid program.
3737
3838 [(e) The Commissioner of Social Services shall amend the Medicaid state plan to provide that chiropractic services shall be covered under the Medicaid program only to the extent required by federal law.]
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4444 Section 1 July 1, 2013 17b-28e
4545
4646 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4747
4848 Section 1
4949
5050 July 1, 2013
5151
5252 17b-28e
5353
5454 Statement of Purpose:
5555
5656 To ensure that eligible Medicaid recipients under the age of twenty-one are not denied chiropractic services.
5757
5858 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]