House | 03/11/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |