House
|
06/03/2013
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7921
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6984
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 351
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
File Number 85
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
House Calendar Number 83
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|