House | 03/27/2013 | File Number 216 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | House Calendar Number 159 | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |