House | 04/08/2013 | File Number 404 | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | House Calendar Number 272 | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/15/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |