House | 04/04/2013 | File Number 364 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | House Calendar Number 244 | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |